skip to content

Ruddock, Nicholas Strickland

CPSO#: 24477

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. N. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018