skip to content

Rubin, Tamar Sarah

CPSO#: 97425

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 23 Apr 2012 to 20 May 2012
EL - Paediatric Respirology

University Of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 08 Feb 2016 to 04 Mar 2016
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 04 Apr 2016 to 01 May 2016
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2016