skip to content

Rubin, Evelyn Tobie

CPSO#: 84697

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellpoint Health Centre
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 969-3260
Fax: (416) 971-7718 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Evelyn Rubin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rubin ( CPSO# 84697 )

Business Address:
Wellpoint Health Centre
9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone Number: (416) 969-3260

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EVELYN TOBIE RUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008