Rubin, Erica Stefanie (CPSO#: 98817)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2015