skip to content

Rubenis, Andrew Arvids

CPSO#: 23909

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Arvids Rubenis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact the following long term care/nursing homes: Extendicare Rouge Valley: 551 Conlins Road, Scarborough ON M1B 5S1; Extendicare Scarborough: 3830 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough ON M1S 1R8; Leisureworld Altamont: 92 Island Road, West Hill ON M1C 2P5; Tony Stacey Centre for Veterans' Care: 59 Lawson Road, Scarborough ON M1C 2J1; Chartwell Guildwood: 65 Livingston Road, Scarborough ON M1E 1L1.
Date Received: 27 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Mar 2015