skip to content

Rozen, Dima

CPSO#: 89605

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C8
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 398-1515
Fax: (416) 398-1516 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rozen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Krasnopolsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rozen ( CPSO# 89605 )
Dr. M. Krasnopolsky ( CPSO# 89677 )

Business Address:
B106-1396 Don Mills Rd
North York ON  M3B 0A7
Phone Number: 4164419500

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009 Active
             Dr.   Dima  Rozen  may  practice  medicine  independently  in  procedural  pain
            management and sedation, only.