skip to content

Roze des Ordons, Amanda Lee

CPSO#: 92631

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
EL - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2010 to 22 Aug 2010
EL - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2013