skip to content

Rozanski, Camilla

CPSO#: 97996

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas, Ontario
N5R 5C4
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196311380 Ext. L
Fax: 5196316143 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rozanski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAMILLA ROZANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZANSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Western University, 29 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Western University, 20 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2018