skip to content

Roy, Monique Suzanne

CPSO#: 32896

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Bordeaux, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2005