skip to content

Roy, Marie Lessard

CPSO#: 32873

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Don Mills Eglinton Medical Centre
29 Gervais Drive
Suite 100
Don Mills ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone: (416) 449-5511
Fax: (416) 449-9334 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marie L. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy ( CPSO# 32873 )

Business Address:
Don Mills-Eglinton Medical Centre
100 - 29 Gervais Drive
North York ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 449-5511

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may write to Dr. Papdopoulos at One Medical Place, 302-20 Wynford Drive, Toronto, ON, M3C 1J4 Phone: 416-445-9673 Fax: 416-445-9388
Date Received: 10 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIE LESSARD ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1981