skip to content

Roy, Marc Andre

CPSO#: 95874

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: 705-474-8600 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Andre Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy ( CPSO# 95874 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P3
Phone Number: (705) 288-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013