skip to content

Roy, Debashis

CPSO#: 90110

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jan 2020
EXPIRY DATE
27 Jan 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Other, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Silchar Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anasthesiology
Room M3200, 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4864 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Holland Centre
43 Wellesley St E
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Jan 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:28 Aug 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 07 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 14 Jan 2019 to 10 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 11 Mar 2019 to 07 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 08 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Debashis  Roy  may  practise  anesthesiology  with Sunnybrook Health
                  Sciences Centre in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision  coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires three years  from
                  the date of issuance  or  when  Dr.  Roy's  eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Roy's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Roy's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  January  28,  2020, and will expire on or
                  before January 27, 2023, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.