skip to content

Rowe, David Simon

CPSO#: 96995

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 8529771 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

525 Causley St
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Canada
Phone: 7053562265
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David S. Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019
Corporation Name: David S. Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rowe ( CPSO# 96995 )

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2265

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID SIMON ROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014