skip to content

Rowe, Andrea Anne

CPSO#: 94981

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Cardiac Care
150 Hespler Rd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

400 Southgate Dr
Guelph ON  N1G 4P5
Canada
Phone: (226) 773-1922
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

The High Metabolic Clinic
10 Four Seasons Pl
Etobicoke ON  M9B 6H7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rowe ( CPSO# 94981 )

Business Address:
131 Frederick Campbell St
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Business Address:
150 Hespler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 6V6
Phone Number: (519) 624-3511

Business Address:
400 Southgate Dr
Guelph ON  N1G 4P5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:01 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2022 Active
 1. Dr. Andrea Anne Rowe may practise:

(i) medicine independently in emergency medicine; and

(ii) obesity medicine with The High Metabolic Clinic in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and only in accordance with the Changing Scope of Practice Program approved by the College.

2. The authority to practice in clause 1(ii) automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. Rowe's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. Rowe's practice, or 

(iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site assessment of Dr. Rowe's practice unsatisfactory, or

(iv) Dr. Rowe is no longer participating in the Change of Scope Program.