skip to content

Rowan-Legg, Anne Kingsley

CPSO#: 85681

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Pediatric Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2571
Fax: (613) 738-4878 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Rowan-Legg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rowan-Legg ( CPSO# 85681 )

Business Address:
CHEO
Division of Pediatric Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 732-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNE KINGSLEY ROWAN-LEGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWAN-LEGG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 23 Oct 2006 to 19 Nov 2006
EL - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2007 to 26 Jan 2007
EL - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007