skip to content

Roussos, Marios

CPSO#: 92724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6366 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chessex & Roussos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roussos ( CPSO# 92724 )
Dr. N. Chessex ( CPSO# 92717 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIOS ROUSSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2010