Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 13 Oct 2021
Summary:
On November 5, 2020 allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Rourke were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now referred to as the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
The Notice of Hearing alleged Dr. Rourke had engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.
The OPSDT heard the matter on October 13, 2021 by videoconference. Counsel for both the College and Dr. Rourke attended the hearing.
On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability) and after hearing submissions of both counsel, the OPSDT found Dr. Rourke committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Disposition
On October 13, 2021, the OPSDT issued its Order directing that:
-Dr. Rourke attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
-The Registrar suspend Dr. Rourke’s certificate of registration for ten months commencing October 14, 2021;
-The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Rourke’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order;
-Dr. Rourke pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00.
The OPSDT’s reasons for decision in this case were released on November 18, 2021 and are available to view below.