skip to content

Rourke, Leslie Lee

CPSO#: 30011

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences Centre 300 Prince Philip Drive St Johns, NL A1B 3V6
Date Received: 12 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014