skip to content

Rouhani, Shiva

CPSO#: 94769

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 601-6601
Fax: (519) 601-6603 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shiva Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rouhani ( CPSO# 94769 )

Business Address:
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 601-6601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active
             Dr. Shiva Rouhani may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.