skip to content

Rouhani, Nassim

CPSO#: 94899

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouhani Medical
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 601-6601
Fax: (519) 601-6603 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nassim Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rouhani ( CPSO# 94899 )

Business Address:
512 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 601-6601

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active
              Dr. Nassim Rouhani may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.