skip to content

Roth, Kirk Martin

CPSO#: 86756

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
403-614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 277-4515
Fax: (519) 888-8272 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roth Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liu ( CPSO# 82727 )
Dr. K. Roth ( CPSO# 86756 )

Business Address:
403 - 614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone Number: (519) 277-4515

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Infectious Diseases Clinic
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4348

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
29 Young Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 603-0223

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Bouelvard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIRK MARTIN ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012