skip to content

Roth Albin, Karina Vanessa

CPSO#: 86842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of the Republic, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 624-9583
Fax: (519) 624-6825 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Roth Albin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Roth Albin ( CPSO# 86842 )

Business Address:
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone Number: (519) 624-9583

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARINA VANESSA ROTH ALBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH ALBIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013