skip to content

Rotbard, Morris

CPSO#: 25691

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone: (416) 694-1400 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Morris Rotbard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotbard ( CPSO# 25691 )

Business Address:
202 - 521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone Number: (416) 694-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MORRIS ROTBARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTBARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.