skip to content

Rotaru, Carmen

CPSO#: 91993

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Ovidius Constanta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3546 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Carmen Rotaru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rotaru ( CPSO# 91993 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:13 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015 Active
             Dr. Carmen Rotaru may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.