skip to content

Rossoni, Melissa Teresa

CPSO#: 98348

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
211-5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-797-0800
Fax: 705-797-0900 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3rd Floor
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0M7
Canada
Phone: 705-721-0370 Ext. 3
Fax: 705-728-8345
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

302-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: 705-728-3766
Fax: 705-728-3757
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cooper and Rossoni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cooper ( CPSO# 98050 )
Dr. M. Rossoni ( CPSO# 98348 )

Business Address:
5 - 211 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-0800

Business Address:
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0M7
Phone Number: (705) 721-0370

Business Address:
Barrie Vascular Associates
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 728-8778

Business Address:
304-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA TERESA ROSSONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2017