skip to content

Rosset, Michael Arthur

CPSO#: 22140

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 109
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 622-6057
Fax: (416) 622-8772 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Rosset Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rosset ( CPSO# 22140 )
Dr. J. Rosset ( CPSO# 76059 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 445-4067

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:18 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ARTHUR ROSSET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969