skip to content

Rosser, Walter Wylie

CPSO#: 21558

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Walter Rosser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Famly Medicine Centre, Queen's University 220 Bagot Street, Kingston ON K7L 5E9, Tel: (613) 533-9303
Date Received: 30 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019