skip to content

Ross, Tracey Lee

CPSO#: 91093

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B, 1140 Tighe St
Ottawa ON  K4M 1A3
Phone: (613) 763-2214
Fax: 613 823 9779 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 613-257 2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Arpnrior Hospital
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613 737-8899 Ext. 72968
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Winchester Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester, ontario
Ottawa ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Arpnrior Hospital
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tracey Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ross ( CPSO# 91093 )

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
118 Holland Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 0X6

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 23 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRACEY LEE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015