skip to content

Ross, Anatoly Dimitri

CPSO#: 89462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
20260 Country Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anatoly Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ross ( CPSO# 89462 )

Business Address:
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-4584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANATOLY DIMITRI ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 19 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2009 to 27 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)