skip to content

Rosman, Michael Alexander

CPSO#: 25577

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 08 Nov 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1973
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 1995

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Sep 1994
Summary:

 In the course of a Discipline Hearing which began in June 1994, Dr. Rosman pleaded guilty to a 
 charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 61(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, 
 as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to 
 practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in a decision which was released in 
 September 1994, found Dr. Rosman guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered on September 6, 1994, that Dr. Rosman's licence to practice be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 08 Nov 1995
Hearing Date(s): Jun 27, 1994