skip to content

Roshan, Tariq Mahmood

CPSO#: 101308

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2018 to 29 Jun 2018
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2018