skip to content

Rosenberg, Morgan Stacey

CPSO#: 90867

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 551-6006
Fax: (416) 551-6009 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Womens College Hospital
Div of Gastroenterology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1500-150 York St
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: 4163505900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Klevan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klevan ( CPSO# 84734 )
Dr. M. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 90867 )

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
700 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 551-6006

Business Address:
4A-2200 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Phone Number: (905) 232-0720

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MORGAN STACEY ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014