Rosenberg, Jonathan Sean (CPSO#: 95955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan S. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 95955 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN SEAN ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013