Rosenberg, Ellimelech (CPSO#: 99018)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2015