skip to content

Rosen, Irving Earl

CPSO#: 18039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. I.E. Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 85 Walmsley Boulevard Toronto ON M4V 1X7
Date Received: 03 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2018