skip to content

Rosen, Clifford Alan

CPSO#: 85938

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
345 Majestic Dr
Lakeshore ON  N8N 4L5
Phone: 5197358410 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rosen ( CPSO# 85938 )

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiolgy
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 3, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 1, 2021, Hôtel-Dieu Grace Healthcare notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that the hospital suspended Dr. Clifford Alan Rosen’s hospital privileges on October 15, 2021, and subsequently revoked Dr. Rosen’s hospital privileges on November 24, 2021, for failure to comply with hospital policy.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 3, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 2, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital suspended Dr. Clifford Alan Rosen’s hospital privileges effective October 15, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.

 

On May 3, 2022, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital revoked / terminated Dr. Rosen’s hospital privileges effective as of January 4, 2022 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:02 Feb 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 01 Jun 2022 Active
 (1 of 2)

As from June 1, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Clifford Alan Rosen, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rosen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. CLIFFORD ALAN ROSEN
("Dr. Rosen")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 

(2)	I, Dr. Rosen, certificate of registration number 85938, am a member of the College.

(3)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that my certificate of registration is restricted, such that I may practice anaesthesiology only.

(4)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that the College has received information regarding my standard of practice and conduct, including information indicating that I practiced outside of my restricted scope of practice of anaesthesiology, and that the College is conducting an investigation, bearing File Number CAS-387323-Y3C6R3 into the information. I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the public. 

(5)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

(6)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.

(7)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Tribunal.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(8)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(9)	Practice Restrictions

(a)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake to further restrict my practice as follows:

(i)	I will not prescribe ivermectin. 

(10)	Posting a Sign

(a)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix "A."  If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter.  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Rosen's practice is restricted to anaesthesiology only. Dr. Rosen must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".

(b)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (10)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A".

(c)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 

(e)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (10)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (10)(d).

(f)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that the College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.

(11)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Rosen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of my restricted certificate of registration and with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

(d)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake that I will maintain a log of all professional encounters with patients, including both in-person encounters and encounters in a virtual setting, in the form attached at Appendix "C" ("Patient Log"). The Patient Log shall include the name of each patient with whom I have a professional encounter and the date of the encounter; the patient's date of birth; the reason for the visit; and the type of visit (i.e., telemedicine or in-person). 

(e)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake that I will provide a copy of the Patient Log to the College every two (2) weeks, or at any other time as requested by the College. 

(f)	I, Dr. Rosen, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.


C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(12)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(13)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(14)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(15)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(16)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal and in the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

(17)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(18)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(19)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Rosen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Rosen's practice is restricted to anaesthesiology only.

The College has received information regarding Dr. Rosen's standard of practice and conduct, including information indicating he practiced outside of his restricted scope of practice of anaesthesiology, and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Rosen has further restricted his practice as follows: 

Dr. Rosen will not prescribe ivermectin. 

Dr. Rosen must post a clearly visible sign in the in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Rosen's practice is restricted to anaesthesiology only. Dr. Rosen must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

D.	CONSENT

(20)	I, Dr. Rosen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(21)	I, Dr. Rosen, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

(2 of 2)

Dr. Clifford Alan Rosen may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia, only. 





Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 1, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr Clifford Alan Rosen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 1, 2022:



Dr. Rosen’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology only.



The College has received information regarding Dr. Rosen’s standard of practice and conduct, including information indicating he practiced outside of his restricted scope of practice of anaesthesiology, and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal, Dr. Rosen has further restricted his practice as follows:



Dr. Rosen will not prescribe ivermectin.



Dr. Rosen must post a clearly visible sign in the in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:



IMPORTANT NOTICE



Dr. Rosen’s practice is restricted to anaesthesiology only. Dr. Rosen must not prescribe ivermectin. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca