skip to content

Rose, Terence John

CPSO#: 22112

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 (416) 398-0638
Instructions: Patients may access copies of their medical records by contacting RSRS
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016