skip to content

Rose, Roger Clive Stewart

CPSO#: 21249

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Roger Rose Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rose ( CPSO# 21249 )

Business Address:
Glendridge Medical Building
1 Belton Boulevard
Suite 201
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone Number: (905) 688-3591

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St.Regis Crescent S. North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 26 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020