skip to content

Rosa Pereira dos Santos, Joana

CPSO#: 96477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 205352 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

301-491 EGLINGTON AVE. TORONTO
Kindercare Pediatrics
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:14 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOANA ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSA PEREIRA DOS SANTOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2020