skip to content

Rona, Zoltan Peter

CPSO#: 30224

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Nov 2022
EXPIRY DATE
04 Nov 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 04 Nov 2022
Summary:

On November 4, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Rona failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to his communications about the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Rona attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. Dr. Rona pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by December 5, 2022.
 
Dr. Rona also entered into an undertaking in which he agreed to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, effective immediately.
 
The panel’s reasons for decisions will be released shortly. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-11-04

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 28, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2022:
 Dr. Rona was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Rona resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: June 2, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 2, 2022:   

 

Dr. Rona is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of a patient and that he incompetent. As a result of the referral:



Dr. Rona must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 21, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)