skip to content

Tan, Romeo Banzon

CPSO#: 91994

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
935 SHEPPARD AVENUE WEST
Unit 1-3
North York ON  M3H 2T7
Phone: (647) 352-6188
Fax: (647) 352-9288 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROMEO BANZON TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Tan’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that during a medical appointment in and around May 2014, Dr. Tan engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including by making comments of a sexual and/or inappropriate nature; and by touching Patient A in a sexual and/or inappropriate manner. It is also alleged that Dr. Tan engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to provide Patient A with a gown/cover during the examination.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: December 10, 2019 Hearing: February 3 - 6, 2020

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: April 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CRIMINAL CHARGES

Dr. Romeo Tan was charged with the following offence:

(1) Sexual assault on or about May 5, 2014, at the City of Toronto, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: April 24, 2019
Place of charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: April 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On April 24, 2019, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Dr. Romeo Tan:

1. Notify specified officer within 24 hours of any change in his address, employment or occupation.

2. Abstain from contacting and/or communicating directly or indirectly with specified person by any physical, electronic or other means, or from going to within 100 metres of anywhere specified person is known to live, work, go to school or happens to be, with certain specified exception.

3. While in the course of his medical employment, he is not to be in the presence of any female patient except in the presence of specified persons or a member of a regulated health profession who is instructed to monitor any physical examination.

4. Not to possess any weapons, as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.