skip to content

Rolnitsky, Asaph

CPSO#: 97093

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2016
EXPIRY DATE
01 Nov 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Room 1436
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5710 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2075 Bayview Ave.
M4 wing
NICU
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164806055
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Asaph Rolnitsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rolnitsky ( CPSO# 97093 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M4 Wing NICU
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6055


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:23 Oct 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 16 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 17 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Dec 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 19 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Oct 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Asaph Rolnitsky may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Rolnitsky holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Rolnitsky  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Rolnitsky's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Rolnitsky's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 2, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 1, 2023.