skip to content

Rollings-Scattergood, Jessica Suzanne Nadine

CPSO#: 93531

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 203
Fergus ON  N1M2W3
Phone: 5197877418
Fax: 5197877421 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Rollings-Scattergood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rollings-Scattergood ( CPSO# 93531 )

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-7418

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA SUZANNE NADINE ROLLINGS-SCATTERGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROLLINGS-SCATTERGOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017