skip to content

Rokach, Binyamin

CPSO#: 92486

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: 6133543301 Ext. 263
Fax: 6133544331
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

242 King St
Trenton ON  K8V5S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

403 Picton Main St
Picton ON  K0K2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

1-H Manor Lane
P.O. Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0L1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

10 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K6
Canada
Phone: (905) 568-3768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

300 Harwood Ave. South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J1
Canada
Phone: 9054268976
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Binyamin Rokach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rokach ( CPSO# 92486 )

Business Address:
QHC Bellevielle General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 696-7400

Business Address:
3 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 543-3301

Business Address:
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
1H Manor Lane
PO Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0K 1C0


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Newfoundland and Labrador
Prince Edward Island
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BINYAMIN ROKACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROKACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2010 to 14 Mar 2010
EL - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2014