skip to content

Roifman, Maian

CPSO#: 89365

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 University Avenue
Suite 940
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-586-4523
Fax: 416-813-5345 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 University Avenue
3rd floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4523
Fax: 416-586-8384
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 03 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAIAN ROIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROIFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2011 to 20 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2015