skip to content

Roifman, Idan

CPSO#: 86124

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M315b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Idan Roifman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roifman ( CPSO# 86124 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M315B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Suite 4076
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1

Business Address:
4430 Bathurst St
North York ON  M3H 3S3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IDAN ROIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROIFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 14 May 2007 to 08 Jun 2007
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2010