skip to content

Rogers, Tabitha Marie Carmel

CPSO#: 84851

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 0 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tabitha Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rogers ( CPSO# 84851 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Schizophrenia
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TABITHA MARIE CARMEL ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011