skip to content

Rogers, Anne Theresa

CPSO#: 28553

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 1984