skip to content

Rogan, George Francis

CPSO#: 24853

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 171 Line 3 North Oro-Medonte, ON L0L 2L0
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.