Rodriguez, Maria Lorena Corazon V (CPSO#: 99372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  16 Nov 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Nov 2016

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Division of Cardiac Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 7377600 Ext. 3640
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2012 to 12 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 16 Nov 2023

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Maria Lorena Corazon V Rodriguez may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
                        Rodriguez holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Rodriguez  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Rodriguez's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Rodriguez's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 17, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 16, 2023.